Docket for 15-6063
No. 15-6063 | |
Title: |
Aaron Powell, Petitioner |
v. |
Steven Tompkins, Sheriff, Suffolk County, Massachusetts |
|
Docketed: | September 15, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-1310) |
Decision Date: | April 15, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | June 11, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 9 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 15, 2015) |
Oct 5 2015 |
Waiver of right of respondent Steven Tompkins, Sheriff, Suffolk County, Massachusetts to respond filed. |
Oct 29 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 13, 2015. |
Nov 5 2015 |
Response Requested . (Due December 7, 2015) |
Nov 23 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 8, 2016. |
Feb 8 2016 |
Brief of respondent Steven Tompkins, Sheriff, Suffolk County, Massachusetts in opposition filed. |
Feb 19 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Aaron Powell filed. |
Feb 25 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 18, 2016. |
Mar 21 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|