Docket for 15-5985
No. 15-5985 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Paul Glen Everett, Petitioner |
v. |
Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections |
|
Docketed: | September 9, 2015 |
Linked with 15A27 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-11857) |
Decision Date: | February 27, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 22, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 1 2015 |
Application (15A27) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 21, 2015 to September 19, 2015, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Jul 9 2015 |
Application (15A27) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until September 19, 2015. |
Sep 4 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 9, 2015) |
Oct 7 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 13, 2015. |
Nov 13 2015 |
Brief of respondent Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections in opposition filed. |
Dec 3 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016. |
Jan 11 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|
|
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | | |
Linda McDermott |
McClain & McDermott, P.A. | (850) 322-2172 |
Counsel of Record | 20301 Grande Oak Blvd | |
| Suite 118-61 | |
| Estero, FL 33928 | |
| lindammcdermott@msn.com |
Party name: Paul Glen Everett |
Attorneys for Respondent: | | |
Celia A. Terenzio |
Assistant Attorney General | (561) 837-5016 |
Counsel of Record |
Office of the Attorney General | |
| 1515 North Flagler Drive, 9th Floor | |
| Suite 900 | |
| West Palm Beach, FL 33401-3432 | |
| celia.terenzio@myfloridalegal.com |
Party name: Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections |
| | |
Leslie Teresa Campbell |
Office of the Attorney General | 561-837-0016 |
| 1515 North Flagler Drive, Suite 900 | |
| West Palm Beach, FL 33401 | |
| Leslie.Campbell@MyFloridaLegal.com |
Party name: Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections |