~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 15 2015 |
Application (14A1275) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 8, 2015 to August 7, 2015, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Jun 19 2015 |
Application (14A1275) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until August 7, 2015. |
Jul 10 2015 |
Application (14A1275) to extend further the time from August 7, 2015 to September 6, 2015, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Jul 15 2015 |
Application (14A1275) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until September 6, 2015. |
Sep 4 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 9, 2015) |
Sep 28 2015 |
Brief of respondent Arkansas in opposition filed. |
Oct 5 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Bruce Ward filed. |
Oct 15 2015 |
Application (15A406) to vacate stay of execution entered by the Supreme Court of Arkansas on October 14, 2015, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Oct 15 2015 |
Response to application from applicant Bruce Ward filed. |
Oct 20 2015 |
Letter received by State of Arkansas requesting Application (15A406) to vacate stay of execution be withdrawn. |
Oct 21 2015 |
Application completed. |
Oct 22 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 6, 2015. |
Nov 9 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |