Docket for 15-5730
No. 15-5730 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Justin White, Petitioner |
v. |
Alabama |
|
Docketed: | August 20, 2015 |
Linked with 15A9 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Criminal Appeals of Alabama |
Case Nos.: | (CR-09-0662) |
Decision Date: | May 2, 2014 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | April 18, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 26 2015 |
Application (15A9) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 16, 2015 to August 17, 2015, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Jul 9 2015 |
Application (15A9) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until August 17, 2015. |
Aug 17 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 21, 2015) |
Sep 11 2015 |
Brief of respondent Alabama in opposition filed. |
Oct 1 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 16, 2015. |
Oct 19 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|