~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 8 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 13, 2015) |
Jul 21 2015 |
Waiver of right of respondent North Carolina to respond filed. |
Aug 5 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015. |
Sep 9 2015 |
Response Requested . (Due October 9, 2015) |
Sep 28 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 9, 2015. |
Nov 9 2015 |
Brief of respondent North Carolina in opposition filed. |
Nov 23 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 11, 2015. |
Nov 30 2015 |
Reply of petitioner David Paul Hall filed. (Distributed) |
Dec 14 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |