Docket for 15-5522
No. 15-5522 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Antonio Lebaron Melton, Petitioner |
v. |
Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections, et al. |
|
Docketed: | August 4, 2015 |
Linked with 14A1115 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-12967) |
Decision Date: | October 9, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | March 3, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Apr 30 2015 |
Application (14A1115) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 1, 2015 to July 31, 2015, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
May 1 2015 |
Application (14A1115) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until July 31, 2015. |
Jul 31 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 3, 2015) |
Sep 1 2015 |
Brief of respondents Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections, et al. in opposition filed. |
Sep 17 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 9, 2015. |
Oct 13 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|