Docket for 15-5474
No. 15-5474 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Kim Raymond Kopatz, Petitioner |
v. |
California |
|
Docketed: | July 31, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of California |
Case Nos.: | (S097414) |
Decision Date: | April 30, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 27 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 31, 2015) |
Aug 28 2015 |
Brief of respondent California in opposition filed. |
Sep 17 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 9, 2015. |
Oct 13 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|