Docket for 15-5140
No. 15-5140 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Jesse Driskill, Petitioner |
v. |
Missouri |
|
Docketed: | July 10, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Missouri |
Case Nos.: | (SC93882) |
Decision Date: | March 31, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | May 26, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 7 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 10, 2015) |
Aug 3 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 9, 2015. |
Sep 10 2015 |
Brief of respondent Missouri in opposition filed. |
Sep 24 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 9, 2015. |
Sep 30 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Jesse Driskill filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 13 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|