Docket for 15-495
No. 15-495 | |
Title: |
The Original Talk Radio Network, Inc., Petitioner |
v. |
Michael Wiener, aka Michael Savage, et al. |
|
Docketed: | October 19, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-16111) |
Decision Date: | July 17, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 15 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 18, 2015) |
Dec 2 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016. |
Jan 11 2016 |
Petition DENIED. |
|