Docket for 15-421
No. 15-421 | |
Title: |
Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc., Petitioner |
v. |
Greg Adkisson, et al. |
|
Docketed: | October 5, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-6207) |
Decision Date: | June 2, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | July 7, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 5 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 4, 2015) |
Nov 3 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 4, 2015. |
Dec 1 2015 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 17, 2015. |
Dec 17 2015 |
Brief of respondents Greg Adkisson, et al. in opposition filed. |
Jan 5 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Jacobs Engineering Group, Inc. filed. |
Jan 6 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 22, 2016. |
Jan 21 2016 |
Supplemental brief of respondents Greg Adkisson, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Jan 25 2016 |
Petition DENIED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
|