Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 15-415
No. 15-415
Title:
Encino Motorcars, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Hector Navarro, et al.
Docketed:October 5, 2015
Linked with 15A210
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(13-55323)
  Decision Date:March 24, 2015
  Rehearing Denied:June 1, 2015
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Aug 19 2015 Application (15A210) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 30, 2015 to September 30, 2015, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Aug 20 2015 Application (15A210) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until September 30, 2015.
Sep 30 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 4, 2015)
Oct 5 2015 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 4, 2015.
Nov 4 2015 Brief amici curiae of National Automobile Dealers Association, et al. filed.
Dec 4 2015 Brief of respondents Hector Navarro, et al. in opposition filed.
Dec 22 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 8, 2016.
Dec 22 2015 Reply of petitioner Encino Motorcars, LLC filed. (Distributed)
Jan 11 2016 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 15, 2016.
Jan 15 2016 Petition GRANTED.
Jan 29 2016 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondents
Feb 1 2016 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioner.
Feb 29 2016 Joint appendix filed.
Feb 29 2016 Brief of petitioner Encino Motorcars, LLC filed.
Mar 4 2016 SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Wednesday April 20, 2016
Mar 7 2016 Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Mar 7 2016 Brief amici curiae of National Automobile Dealers Association, et al. filed.
Mar 14 2016 Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Mar 15 2016 CIRCULATED.
Mar 30 2016 Brief of respondents Hector Navarro, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Apr 5 2016 Brief amicus curiae of International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, AFL-CIO filed. (Distributed)
Apr 6 2016 Brief amicus curiae of the United States filed. (Distributed)
Apr 6 2016 Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Apr 6 2016 Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
Apr 6 2016 Brief amici curiae of National Employment Lawyers Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Apr 8 2016 Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Apr 13 2016 Reply of petitioner Encino Motorcars, LLC filed. (Distributed)
Apr 14 2016 Letter, dated14 April 2016, received from counsel for respondents filed. (Distributed).
Apr 20 2016 Argued. For petitioner: Paul D. Clement, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Stephanos Bibas, Philadelphia, Pa.; and Anthony A. Yang, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae).
Jun 20 2016 Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED. Kennedy, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Ginsburg, Breyer, Sotomayor, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Ginsburg, J., filed a concurring opinion, in which Sotomayor, J., joined. Thomas, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Alito, J., joined.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Paul D. Clement Bancroft PLLC(202) 234-0090
    Counsel of Record500 New Jersey Ave., NW
Seventh Floor
Washington, DC  20001
pclement@bancroftpllc.com
Party name: Encino Motorcars, LLC
Attorneys for Respondents:
Stephanos Bibas University of Pennsylvania Law School (215) 746-2297
    Counsel of RecordSupreme Court Clinic
3501 Sansom Street
Philadelphia, PA  19104-6204
sbibas@law.upenn.edu
Party name: Hector Navarro, et al.
Other:
Terisa Eileen Chaw National Employment Lawyers Association(415) 296-7629
2201 Broadway, Suite 402
Oakland, CA  94104
tchaw@nelahq.org
Party name: National Employment Lawyers Association, et al.
 
David C. Frederick Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, P.L.L(202)-326-7951
Sumner Square 1615 M Street, NW,
Suite 400
Washington, DC  20036-3209
dfrederick@khhte.com
Party name: Law Professors
 
Matthew W. Lampe Jones Day(212) 326-3939
222 East 41st Street
New York, NY  10017
mwlampe@jonesday.com
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
 
Felicia Reid Hirschfeld Kraemer LLP(415) 835-9000
505 Montgomery Street, Suite 1300
San Francisco, CA  94111
freid@hkemploymentlaw.com
Party name: National Automobile Dealers Association, et al.
 
David A. Rosenfeld Weinberg, Roger & Rosenfeld(510) 337-1001
1001 Marina Village Parkway, Suite 200
Alameda, CA  94501-1091
Party name: International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, AFL-CIO.
 
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: the United States
 
Anthony Alan Yang Office of the Solicitor General (202)-514-4821
950 Pennsylvania Ave.NW
Room 5615
Washington, DC  20530-0001
Party name: United States
July 01, 2016 | Version 2014.1