Docket for 14A665
No. 14A665 | |
Title: |
Dow Chemical Company, Applicant |
v. |
Industrial Polymers, Inc., et al. |
|
Docketed: | December 19, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 17 2014 |
Application (14A665) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 5, 2015 to March 9, 2015, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. |
Dec 22 2014 |
Application (14A665) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until March 9, 2015. |
|