Docket for 14-9864
No. 14-9864 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Kayle Barrington Bates, Petitioner |
v. |
Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections |
|
Docketed: | May 19, 2015 |
Linked with 14A892 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-11882) |
Decision Date: | September 5, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | December 16, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Feb 23 2015 |
Application (14A892) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 16, 2015 to May 15, 2015, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Feb 26 2015 |
Application (14A892) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until May 15, 2015. |
May 15 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 18, 2015) |
Jun 18 2015 |
Brief of respondent Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections in opposition filed. |
Jul 2 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015. |
Jul 24 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Kayle Barrington Bates filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 5 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|