Docket for 14-9844
No. 14-9844 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Licho Escamilla, Petitioner |
v. |
William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division |
|
Docketed: | May 18, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (12-70029) |
Decision Date: | February 18, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 14 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 17, 2015) |
Jun 17 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 17, 2015. |
Jul 17 2015 |
Brief of respondent William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. |
Aug 6 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015. |
Aug 19 2015 |
Record Requested . |
Aug 21 2015 |
Record received from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit. The record is electronic and available on PACER. |
Aug 31 2015 |
Record received from the U.S.D.C. for the Northern District of Texas (3 boxes). |
Sep 3 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015. |
Oct 5 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
Oct 20 2015 |
Record from U.S.D.C. Northern District of Texas has been returned. |
|