Docket for 14-9703
No. 14-9703 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Antyane Robinson, Petitioner |
v. |
John E. Wetzel, Secretary, Pennsylvania Department of Corrections, et al. |
|
Docketed: | May 11, 2015 |
Linked with 14A999 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-9003) |
Decision Date: | August 12, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | January 5, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 25 2015 |
Application (14A999) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 5, 2015 to June 4, 2015, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Mar 27 2015 |
Application (14A999) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until May 5, 2015. |
May 5 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 10, 2015) |
Jul 10 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 11, 2015. |
Aug 26 2015 |
Brief of respondents John E. Wetzel, Secretary, Pennsylvania Department of Corrections, et al. in opposition filed. |
Sep 8 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Antyane Robinson filed. (Distributed) |
Sep 10 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015. |
Oct 5 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|