~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 30 2014 |
Application (14A728) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 19, 2015 to April 20, 2015, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Jan 6 2015 |
Application (14A728) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 21, 2015. |
Feb 20 2015 |
Application (14A728) to extend further the time from March 21, 2015 to April 20, 2015, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Mar 3 2015 |
Application (14A728) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until April 20, 2015. |
Apr 20 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 26, 2015) |
May 15 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 25, 2015. |
Jun 19 2015 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including July 24, 2015. |
Jul 24 2015 |
Brief of respondent Wendy Kelley, Director, Arkansas Department of Correction in opposition filed. |
Aug 13 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015. |
Aug 27 2015 |
Record Requested . |
Sep 8 2015 |
Record received from the U.S.C.A. 8th Circuit (1 envelope). |
Sep 10 2015 |
Record received from the U.S.D.C. Eastern District of Arkansas (2 boxes). |
Sep 17 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 9, 2015. |
Sep 22 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Ladell Lee filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 13 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
Oct 20 2015 |
Record from U.S.C.A. 8th Circuit has been returned. |
Oct 20 2015 |
Record from U.S.D.C. Eastern District of Arkansas has been returned. |