Docket for 14-9380
No. 14-9380 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
David Russell Hosier, Petitioner |
v. |
Missouri |
|
Docketed: | April 17, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Missouri |
Case Nos.: | (SC93855) |
Decision Date: | February 3, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | March 31, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Apr 14 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 18, 2015) |
May 18 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 17, 2015. |
Jun 17 2015 |
Brief of respondent Missouri in opposition filed. |
Jul 2 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015. |
Oct 5 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|