Docket for 14-9317
No. 14-9317 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Kwame A. Rockwell, Petitioner |
v. |
Texas |
|
Docketed: | April 14, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas |
Case Nos.: | (WR-80,232-01) |
Decision Date: | December 17, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 17 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 14, 2015) |
May 11 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 15, 2015. |
Jun 5 2015 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including July 15, 2015. |
Jul 15 2015 |
Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed. |
Jul 27 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Kwame A. Rockwell filed. |
Jul 30 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015. |
Oct 5 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|