Docket for 14-9148
No. 14-9148 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Raphael Deon Holiday, Petitioner |
v. |
William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division |
|
Docketed: | April 2, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-70022) |
Decision Date: | October 14, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | December 29, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 27 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 4, 2015) |
May 1 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 3, 2015. |
May 27 2015 |
Brief of respondent William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. |
Jun 10 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 25, 2015. |
Jun 29 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|