Docket for 14-9137
No. 14-9137 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
David Allen Lucas, Petitioner |
v. |
California |
|
Docketed: | April 1, 2015 |
Linked with 14A821 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of California |
Case Nos.: | (S012279) |
Decision Date: | August 21, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 12, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 27 2015 |
Application (14A821) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 10, 2015 to April 11, 2015, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Jan 29 2015 |
Application (14A821) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until April 11, 2015. |
Mar 28 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 1, 2015) |
Apr 29 2015 |
Brief of respondent California in opposition filed. |
May 13 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 28, 2015. |
Jun 1 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|