Docket for 14-9114
No. 14-9114 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Angela Darlene McAnulty, Petitioner |
v. |
Oregon |
|
Docketed: | March 31, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Oregon |
Case Nos.: | (S059476) |
Decision Date: | October 30, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | January 15, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 26 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 30, 2015) |
Apr 20 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including June 1, 2015. |
May 28 2015 |
Brief of respondent Oregon in opposition filed. |
Jun 18 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015. |
Oct 5 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|