Docket for 14-906
No. 14-906 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Thomas D. Woodel, Petitioner |
v. |
Florida |
|
Docketed: | January 27, 2015 |
Linked with 14A521 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Florida |
Case Nos.: | (SC12-132) |
Decision Date: | June 5, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 28, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 14 2014 |
Application (14A521) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 26, 2014 to January 25, 2015, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Nov 19 2014 |
Application (14A521) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until January 25, 2015. |
Jan 26 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 26, 2015) |
Feb 26 2015 |
Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed. |
Mar 17 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Thomas D. Woodel filed. |
Mar 18 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 3, 2015. |
Apr 6 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|