Docket for 14-9056
No. 14-9056 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Richard Bernard Moore, Petitioner |
v. |
South Carolina |
|
Docketed: | March 26, 2015 |
Linked with 14A774 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Common Pleas of South Carolina, Spartanburg County |
Case Nos.: | (2004-CP-42-2715) |
Decision Date: | August 1, 2011 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | September 11, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 24, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 9 2015 |
Application (14A774) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 22, 2015 to March 23, 2015, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Jan 21 2015 |
Application (14A774) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until March 23, 2015. |
Mar 23 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 27, 2015) |
Apr 23 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 27, 2015. |
May 27 2015 |
Brief of respondent South Carolina in opposition filed. |
Jun 8 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Richard Bernard Moore filed. (Distributed) |
Jun 10 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 25, 2015. |
Jun 29 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|