Docket for 14-9041
No. 14-9041 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Jose Trinidad Loza, Petitioner |
v. |
Charlotte Jenkins, Warden |
|
Docketed: | March 25, 2015 |
Linked with 14A702 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-3453) |
Decision Date: | September 2, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 24, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 22 2014 |
Application (14A702) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 22, 2015 to March 23, 2015, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Dec 31 2014 |
Application (14A702) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until March 23, 2015. |
Mar 23 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 24, 2015) |
Apr 10 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 26, 2015. |
Apr 24 2015 |
Brief amicus curiae of United Mexican States filed. |
May 26 2015 |
Brief of respondent Charlotte Jenkins, Warden in opposition filed. |
Jun 8 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Jose Trinidad Loza filed. |
Jun 10 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 25, 2015. |
Jun 29 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|