Docket for 14-9020
No. 14-9020 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Joel Dale Wright, Petitioner |
v. |
Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections |
|
Docketed: | March 24, 2015 |
Linked with 14A751 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-11832) |
Decision Date: | August 4, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 17, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 8 2015 |
Application (14A751) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 15, 2015 to March 16, 2015, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Jan 13 2015 |
Application (14A751) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until February 16, 2015. |
Jan 27 2015 |
Application (14A751) to extend further the time from February 16, 2015 to March 16, 2015, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Feb 3 2015 |
Application (14A751) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 16, 2015. |
Mar 16 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 23, 2015) |
Apr 23 2015 |
Brief of respondent Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections in opposition filed. |
May 13 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 28, 2015. |
Jun 1 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|