Docket for 14-8969
No. 14-8969 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
James Frazier, Petitioner |
v. |
Charlotte Jenkins, Warden |
|
Docketed: | March 20, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-4262) |
Decision Date: | October 27, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | December 18, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 16 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 20, 2015) |
Apr 8 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 20, 2015. |
May 15 2015 |
Brief of respondent Charlotte Jenkins, Warden in opposition filed. |
Jun 3 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 18, 2015. |
Jun 22 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|