Docket for 14-8782
No. 14-8782 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Ray Dansby, Petitioner |
v. |
Wendy Kelley, Director, Arkansas Department of Correction |
|
Docketed: | March 10, 2015 |
Linked with 14A786 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (10-1990) |
Decision Date: | September 5, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | November 18, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 20 2015 |
Application (14A786) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 16, 2015 to April 17, 2015, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Jan 23 2015 |
Application (14A786) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 18, 2015. |
Mar 5 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 9, 2015) |
Apr 1 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including May 8, 2015. |
Apr 28 2015 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including June 5, 2015. |
Jun 5 2015 |
Brief of respondent Wendy Kelley, Director, Arkansas Department of Correction in opposition filed. |
Jun 8 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Ray Dansby filed. |
Jun 18 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015. |
Oct 5 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|