Docket for 14-8568
No. 14-8568 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Avram Vineto Nika, Petitioner |
v. |
Renee Baker, Warden, et al. |
|
Docketed: | February 24, 2015 |
Linked with 14A763 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Nevada |
Case Nos.: | (59776) |
Decision Date: | July 30, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 23, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 10 2015 |
Application (14A763) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 21, 2015 to February 20, 2015, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Jan 14 2015 |
Application (14A763) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until February 20, 2015. |
Feb 20 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 26, 2015) |
Mar 26 2015 |
Brief of respondents Renee Baker, Warden, et al. in opposition filed. |
Apr 7 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Avram Vineto Nika filed. (Distributed) |
Apr 9 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 24, 2015. |
Apr 27 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|