Docket for 14-8461
No. 14-8461 | |
Title: |
Clarence Nesbit, Petitioner |
v. |
Tennessee |
|
Docketed: | February 19, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Tennessee, Western Division |
Case Nos.: | (W2009-02101-SC-R11-PD) |
Decision Date: | November 14, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Feb 12 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 23, 2015) |
Mar 13 2015 |
Waiver of right of respondent Tennessee to respond filed. |
Mar 26 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 17, 2015. |
Apr 20 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|