Docket for 14-8416
No. 14-8416 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Robert Carrasco, Petitioner |
v. |
California |
|
Docketed: | February 12, 2015 |
Linked with 14A586 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of California |
Case Nos.: | (S077009) |
Decision Date: | August 4, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 10, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 25 2014 |
Application (14A586) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 9, 2014 to February 7, 2015, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Dec 4 2014 |
Application (14A586) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until February 7, 2015. |
Feb 6 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 16, 2015) |
Mar 13 2015 |
Brief of respondent California in opposition filed. |
Apr 2 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 17, 2015. |
Apr 20 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|