Docket for 14-8389
No. 14-8389 | |
Title: |
Ronald Knight, Petitioner |
v. |
Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections, et al. |
|
Docketed: | February 10, 2015 |
Linked with 14A568 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-11024) |
Decision Date: | July 9, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 3, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 15 2014 |
Application (14A568) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 2, 2014 to January 31, 2015, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Dec 2 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 12, 2015) |
Dec 3 2014 |
Application (14A568) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until January 31, 2015. |
Feb 10 2015 |
Waiver of right of respondents Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections, et al. to respond filed. |
Feb 26 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 20, 2015. |
Mar 23 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|