Docket for 14-8232
No. 14-8232 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Marbel Mendoza, Petitioner |
v. |
Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections |
|
Docketed: | February 2, 2015 |
Linked with 14A530 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-14968) |
Decision Date: | July 31, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 3, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 14 2014 |
Application (14A530) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 2, 2014 to January 31, 2015, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Nov 19 2014 |
Application (14A530) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until January 31, 2015. |
Jan 29 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 4, 2015) |
Feb 26 2015 |
Brief of respondent Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections in opposition filed. |
Mar 12 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 27, 2015. |
Mar 30 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|