Docket for 14-8109
No. 14-8109 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Warren K. Henness, Petitioner |
v. |
Margaret Bagley, Warden |
|
Docketed: | January 23, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-3934) |
Decision Date: | September 8, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 23, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 20 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 23, 2015) |
Feb 20 2015 |
Brief of respondent Margaret Bagley, Warden in opposition filed. |
Mar 12 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 27, 2015. |
Mar 30 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|