Docket for 14-8097
No. 14-8097 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Robert Lynn Pruett, Petitioner |
v. |
Texas |
|
Docketed: | January 23, 2015 |
Linked with 14A793 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas |
Case Nos.: | (AP-77,037) |
Decision Date: | October 22, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 15 2015 |
Application (14A793) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Scalia. |
Jan 20 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 23, 2015) |
Feb 23 2015 |
Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed. |
Mar 11 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Robert Lynn Pruett filed. (Distributed) |
Mar 12 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 27, 2015. |
Mar 30 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
Apr 2 2015 |
Application (14A793) denied by Justice Scalia. |
|