Docket for 14-8015
No. 14-8015 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Gene Estel McCurdy, Petitioner |
v. |
California |
|
Docketed: | January 16, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of California |
Case Nos.: | (S061026) |
Decision Date: | August 14, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 15, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 13 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 17, 2015) |
Feb 10 2015 |
Brief of respondent California in opposition filed. |
Feb 26 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 20, 2015. |
Mar 23 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|