Docket for 14-8000
No. 14-8000 | |
Title: |
John Ray Falk, Jr., Petitioner |
v. |
Texas |
|
Docketed: | January 16, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeals of Texas, Tenth District |
Case Nos.: | (10-13-00233-CR) |
Decision Date: | July 24, 2014 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | October 15, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 12 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 17, 2015) |
Mar 5 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 20, 2015. |
Mar 23 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|