Docket for 14-7874
No. 14-7874 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Michael Dean Scott, Petitioner |
v. |
Jay Forshey, Warden |
|
Docketed: | January 7, 2015 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-4361) |
Decision Date: | July 28, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 2, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 30 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 6, 2015) |
Jan 21 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 20, 2015. |
Feb 18 2015 |
Brief of respondent Jay Forshey, Warden in opposition filed. |
Mar 5 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 20, 2015. |
Mar 23 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|