Docket for 14-7855
No. 14-7855 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Thomas Dewey Pope, Petitioner |
v. |
Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections |
|
Docketed: | January 6, 2015 |
Linked with 14A410 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-11789) |
Decision Date: | May 15, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 7, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 14 2014 |
Application (14A410) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 5, 2014 to January 4, 2015, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Oct 17 2014 |
Application (14A410) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until January 4, 2015. |
Jan 2 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 5, 2015) |
Feb 11 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 12, 2015. |
Feb 12 2015 |
Brief of respondent Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections in opposition filed. |
Feb 26 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 20, 2015. |
Mar 23 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|