Docket for 14-7760
No. 14-7760 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Clifton Lamar Williams, Petitioner |
v. |
William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division |
|
Docketed: | December 30, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-70015) |
Decision Date: | August 1, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 25, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 23 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 29, 2015) |
Jan 29 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 2, 2015. |
Mar 2 2015 |
Brief of respondent William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. |
Mar 19 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 3, 2015. |
Apr 6 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|