~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 1 2014 |
Application (14A360) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 16, 2014 to December 15, 2014, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Oct 3 2014 |
Application (14A360) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until December 1, 2014. |
Dec 1 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 28, 2015) |
Jan 20 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 27, 2015. |
Feb 13 2015 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including March 30, 2015. |
Mar 19 2015 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including April 30, 2015. |
Apr 30 2015 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 29, 2015. |
May 29 2015 |
Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. |
Jun 12 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Dustin Lee Honken filed. |
Jun 18 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015. |
Oct 5 2015 |
Petition DENIED. Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |