Docket for 14-7683
No. 14-7683 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Dayva Cross, Petitioner |
v. |
Washington |
|
Docketed: | December 23, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Washington |
Case Nos.: | (79761-7) |
Decision Date: | September 26, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 6, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 17 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 22, 2015) |
Jan 21 2015 |
Brief amici curiae of Washington Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al. filed. |
Jan 27 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 23, 2015. |
Feb 23 2015 |
Brief of respondent Washington in opposition filed. |
Mar 4 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Dayva Cross filed. |
Mar 12 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 27, 2015. |
Mar 30 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|