Docket for 14-7680
No. 14-7680 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Kelvyn Rondell Banks, Petitioner |
v. |
California |
|
Docketed: | December 23, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of California |
Case Nos.: | (S080477) |
Decision Date: | August 14, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 24, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 16 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 22, 2015) |
Jan 16 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 23, 2015. |
Feb 23 2015 |
Brief of respondent California in opposition filed. |
Mar 4 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Kelvyn Rondell Banks filed. (Distributed) |
Mar 12 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 27, 2015. |
Mar 30 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|