Docket for 14-7664
No. 14-7664 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Terrick Terrell Nooner, Petitioner |
v. |
Arkansas |
|
Docketed: | December 22, 2014 |
Linked with 14A258 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Arkansas |
Case Nos.: | (CR-94-358) |
Decision Date: | June 26, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 3 2014 |
Application (14A258) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 24, 2014 to October 24, 2014, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Sep 8 2014 |
Application (14A258) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until October 24, 2014. |
Oct 20 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 21, 2015) |
Jan 13 2015 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 20, 2015. |
Feb 20 2015 |
Brief of respondent Arkansas in opposition filed. |
Mar 4 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Terrick Terrell Nooner filed. |
Mar 12 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 27, 2015. |
Mar 30 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|