Docket for 14-7349
No. 14-7349 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Elrico Darnell Fowler, Petitioner |
v. |
Carlton Joyner, Warden |
|
Docketed: | December 3, 2014 |
Linked with 14A284 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-4) |
Decision Date: | June 2, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | June 30, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 11 2014 |
Application (14A284) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 28, 2014 to November 27, 2014, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Sep 15 2014 |
Application (14A284) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until November 27, 2014. |
Nov 26 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 5, 2015) |
Dec 3 2014 |
Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondent. |
Dec 3 2014 |
Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioner. |
Dec 10 2014 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 4, 2015. |
Feb 4 2015 |
Brief of respondent Carlton Joyner, Warden in opposition filed. |
Feb 19 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 6, 2015. |
Mar 9 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|