Docket for 14-7059
No. 14-7059 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Vide 14-7386 | |
Title: |
Donald Franklin Smith, Petitioner |
v. |
California |
|
Docketed: | November 10, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of California |
Case Nos.: | (S049596) |
Decision Date: | August 25, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 1, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 5 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 10, 2014) |
Dec 8 2014 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 9, 2015. |
Jan 8 2015 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including January 26, 2015. |
Jan 22 2015 |
Brief of respondent California in opposition filed. |
Mar 26 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 17, 2015. |
Apr 20 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|