~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 28 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 1, 2014) |
Nov 25 2014 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 31, 2014. |
Dec 30 2014 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including January 30, 2015. |
Jan 27 2015 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including March 2, 2015. |
Mar 2 2015 |
Brief of respondent California in opposition filed. |
Mar 11 2015 |
Reply of petitioner John Leo Capistrano filed. |
Mar 19 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 3, 2015. |
Apr 6 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |