Docket for 14-692
No. 14-692 | |
Title: |
Ho Keung Tse, Petitioner |
v. |
Google, Inc., et al. |
|
Docketed: | December 11, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (2014-1222) |
Decision Date: | July 16, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 15, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 11 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 12, 2015) |
Dec 17 2014 |
Waiver of right of respondent HTC America, Inc. to respond filed. |
Dec 19 2014 |
Waiver of right of respondent Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC to respond filed. |
Dec 29 2014 |
Waiver of right of respondent Google, Inc. to respond filed. |
Jan 21 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 20, 2015. |
Feb 23 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|