Docket for 14-6898
No. 14-6898 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Vide 14-6800 | |
Title: |
Stephen Edward Hajek, Petitioner |
v. |
California |
|
Docketed: | October 29, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of California |
Case Nos.: | (S049626) |
Decision Date: | May 5, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | July 23, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 17 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 28, 2014) |
Dec 18 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2015. |
Jan 20 2015 |
Brief of respondent California in opposition filed. |
Feb 5 2015 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 20, 2015. |
Feb 23 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|