Docket for 14-6371
No. 14-6371 | |
Title: |
Conrad Robert Murray, Petitioner |
v. |
California |
|
Docketed: | September 23, 2014 |
Linked with 14A74 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District |
Case Nos.: | (B237677) |
Decision Date: | January 15, 2014 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | April 23, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 14 2014 |
Application (14A74) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 22, 2014 to September 20, 2014, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Jul 22 2014 |
Application (14A74) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until September 20, 2014. |
Sep 2 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 23, 2014) |
Oct 15 2014 |
Waiver of right of respondent California to respond filed. |
Oct 23 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 7, 2014. |
Nov 10 2014 |
Petition DENIED. |
|