Docket for 14-6033
No. 14-6033 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Warren Lee Hill, Jr., Petitioner |
v. |
Brian Owens, Commissioner, Georgia Department of Corrections, et al. |
|
Docketed: | August 29, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Georgia |
Case Nos.: | (S14A0092) |
Decision Date: | May 19, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | June 16, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 22 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 29, 2014) |
Sep 29 2014 |
Brief of respondents Brian Owens, Commissioner, Georgia Department of Corrections, et al. in opposition filed. |
Oct 16 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 31, 2014. |
Oct 16 2014 |
Reply of petitioner Warren Lee Hill, Jr. filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 23 2014 |
Supplemental brief of petitioner Warren Lee Hill, Jr. filed. (Distributed) |
Oct 28 2014 |
Second supplemental brief of petitioner Warren Lee Hill, Jr. filed. (Distributed) |
Nov 3 2014 |
Petition DENIED. |
|